EP0005077 - Extrusion apparatus and method of use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIROYAL LTD. 895 Don Mills Road Ontario M3C 1W3 / CA | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giesbrecht, George Gerhardt 46 Buttonwood Drive Kitchener Ontario / CA | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Geldard, David Guthrie, et al URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds, LS2 8PB West Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/05] | Geldard, David Guthrie, et al URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds, LS2 8PB West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300694.1 | 25.04.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780899910 | 26.04.1978 Original published format: US 899910 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005077 | Date: | 31.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005077 | Date: | 03.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B29D7/02, B29F3/00, B29H3/00 | [1982/05] | CPC: |
B29C48/35 (EP,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Extruder und Anwendung desselben | English: | Extrusion apparatus and method of use thereof | French: | Boudineuse et méthode pour son utilisation | Examination procedure | 19.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/12] | 21.11.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.08.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1251365 [ ] (ETABLISSEMENTS ANDOUART SOC D); | US3142091 [ ] (CURTISS DONALD N); | CH401453 [ ] (GABBRIELLI ERNESTO DR ING [AU]); | US3869304 [ ] (BOGULSLAWSKI JAN JANUSZ, et al); | US3871810 [ ] (GEYER PAUL) |