EP0005990 - A method of repairing or modifying saddles and seats for motor-cycles and cycles; and units for use in such method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1982 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PULLEY BROTHERS LIMITED 40 Bracebridge Street Newtown Birmingham B6 4JP / GB | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pulley, Arthur 391 Walmley Road Sutton Coldfield West Midlands / GB | 02 /
Pulley, Roy Stanley 7 South Drive Lichfield Park Sutton Coldfield West Midlands / GB | 03 /
Homer, Robert 47 King Charles Road Halesowen West Midlands / GB | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Skerrett, William Gordon, et al X / GB | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79300981.2 | 29.05.1979 | Priority number, date | GB19780025298 | 31.05.1978 Original published format: GB 2529878 | GB19380078578 | 29.09.1978 Original published format: GB 3878578 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005990 | Date: | 12.12.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B62J1/20 | CPC: |
B62J1/20 (EP);
B62J1/12 (EP);
B62J1/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Methode zum Reparieren oder Modifizieren von Sätteln und Sitzen für Motorräder und Fahrräder und Elemente zum Gebrauch bei einer derartigen Methode | English: | A method of repairing or modifying saddles and seats for motor-cycles and cycles; and units for use in such method | French: | Méthode pour réparer ou modifier des selles et des sièges pour motocyclettes et bicyclettes et éléments destinés à être utilisés dans une telle méthode | File destroyed: | 30.10.1991 | Examination procedure | 04.12.1979 | Examination requested [1980/04] | 16.06.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.04.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: non payment of additional claims fees [1982/10] | 14.12.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1981 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB715742 [ ] (WRIGHT SADDLE COMPANY LTD); | US3388946 [ ] (GRACE RONALD R); | US3808075 [ ] (WORLEY G); | FR2368394 [ ] (STARS SPA [IT]); | GB2225316 [ ] (CONDEA CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) |