EP0006716 - Contact fuser apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mosher, Rabin 739 Ayrault Road Fairport, New York 14450 / US | [1980/01] | Representative(s) | Prior, Nicholas John, et al Rank Xerox Patent Department 338 Euston Road London NW1 3BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/31] | Prior, Nicholas J. European Patent Attorney, et al Rank Xerox Patent Department 338 Euston Road London NW1 3BH / GB | ||
Former [1980/01] | Prior, Nicholas J Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department Rank Xerox House 153 - 157 Cleveland Street London W1 / GB | Application number, filing date | 79301139.6 | 14.06.1979 | [1980/01] | Priority number, date | US19780920110 | 28.06.1978 Original published format: US 920110 | [1980/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006716 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0006716 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [1980/01] | CPC: |
G03G15/2025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1980/01] | Title | German: | Kontaktschmelzvorrichtung | [1980/01] | English: | Contact fuser apparatus | [1980/01] | French: | Appareil de fusion par contact | [1980/01] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/14] | 30.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.02.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1571129 [ ]; | DE2344810 [ ] (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | US3861861 [ ] (THETTU RAGHULINGA R); | US3964431 [ ] (NAMIKI RYOICHI); | US4136613 [ ] (NAMIKI RYOICHI); | JPS5226836 [ ] | [ ] - "PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN", Vol. 1, No. 92, August 25, 1977page 2397 E 77; & JP-A-52 026 836. |