EP0007744 - Assay for thyroid hormone binding capacity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company Mack Centre Drive P.O. Box 2224 Paramus New Jersey 07652-1149 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company Mack Centre Drive P.O. Box 2224 Paramus New Jersey 07652-1149 / US | ||
Former [1980/03] | For all designated states BECTON DICKINSON & COMPANY Mack Centre Drive Paramus, New Jersey 07652 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reese, Max G. 977 E. 5600 South Salt Lake City, Utah / US | 02 /
Johnson, LaVell R. 3201, Teton Drive Salt Lake City, Utah / US | [1980/03] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/03] | Ruffles, Graham Keith MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 79301365.7 | 11.07.1979 | [1980/03] | Priority number, date | US19780923712 | 12.07.1978 Original published format: US 923712 | [1980/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0007744 | Date: | 06.02.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0007744 | Date: | 03.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/58, G01N33/78 | [1980/03] | CPC: |
G01N33/78 (EP,US);
Y10S436/808 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Thyroxin-Bindungsindexes | [1980/03] | English: | Assay for thyroid hormone binding capacity | [1980/03] | French: | Procédé pour le dosage de la globuline fixatrice d'hormones thyroidiennes | [1980/03] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/12] | 22.07.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 15.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.08.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3896217 [ ] (JOHNSON LAVELL R); | US4059685 [ ] (JOHNSON LAVELL R); | US4005187 [ ] (KILTHAU GUSTAVE F, et al); | US4032626 [ ] (WARD FRANK B); | US3888629 [ ] (BAGSHAWE KENNETH DAWSON); | US4108976 [ ] (REESE MAX G); | US4009005 [ ] (JOHNSON LAVELL R) |