EP0007782 - Fluid flow measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Redding, Robert James September House Cox Green Lane Maidenhead, Berks. SL6 3EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/03] | For all designated states Redding, Robert James September House Cox Green Lane Maidenhead, Berks. SL6 3EL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/03] | Representative(s) | Abbott, Leonard Charles, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HN / GB | [1980/03] | Application number, filing date | 79301439.0 | 19.07.1979 | [1980/03] | Priority number, date | GB19300077478 | 22.07.1978 Original published format: GB 3077478 | [1980/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0007782 | Date: | 06.02.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0007782 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/66, G01P5/00 | [1980/03] | CPC: |
G01F1/667 (EP,US);
G01P5/248 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1980/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Messen eines Flüssigkeitsdurchflusses | [1980/03] | English: | Fluid flow measuring apparatus | [1980/03] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de l'écoulement d'un fluide | [1980/03] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1980 | Examination requested [1981/06] | 23.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.02.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.08.1982 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3420102 [ ] (BROWN ALVIN E); | FR2259355 [ ] (FIAT SPA [IT]); | US3894431 [ ] (MUSTON ALBERT HENRY, et al); | US3165928 [ ] (LEO POULOS); | US3751979 [ ] (IMS J) | [ ] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, Vol. IM-23, Nr. 3, September 1974, pages 203-210 New YorkU.S.A. J.H. STICHMAN: "A Sonic Velometer" * Figures 2,6 * | [ ] - CONTROL & INSTRUMENTATION, Vol. 5, No. 10, November 1973, pages 38-41 LondonG.B. "Measuring flow: Time to reconsider ultrasonic methods" * Figure 7 * |