EP0007814 - Manufacture of extruded products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1984 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BICC Public Limited Company 21, Bloomsbury Street London, WC1B 3QN / GB | [1983/22] |
Former [1980/03] | For all designated states BICC Limited 21, Bloomsbury Street London, WC1B 3QN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verne, Stefan 3 Brunswick Gardens London W5 / GB | [1980/03] | Representative(s) | Poole, Michael John, et al 16 Youings Drive Barnstaple Devon EX31 1QL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/03] | Poole, Michael John, et al BICC plc Patents and Licensing Department Quantum House Maylands Avenue Hemel Hempstead, Herts. HP2 4SJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 79301544.7 | 01.08.1979 | [1980/03] | Priority number, date | GB19320005378 | 02.08.1978 Original published format: GB 3205378 | [1980/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0007814 | Date: | 06.02.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0007814 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B29D9/00, H01B13/24 | [1980/03] | CPC: |
H01B13/24 (EP,US);
B29C48/0016 (EP,US);
B29C48/06 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C48/304 (EP,US);
H01B13/14 (EP,US);
B29K2105/20 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3462 (EP,US);
Y10S264/54 (EP,US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/03] | Title | German: | Herstellung von extrudierten Produkten | [1980/03] | English: | Manufacture of extruded products | [1980/03] | French: | Fabrication de produits extrudés | [1980/03] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/23] | 26.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/23] | Request for further processing for: | 08.03.1982 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.1982 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.04.1982 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1983 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US2471752 [ ] (INGMANSON JOHN H); | US3600487 [ ] (ZAVASNIK FREDRICK); | FR2197713 [ ] (MARUHACHI KASEI KOGYO KK [JP]); | FR2347805 [ ] (FRAENK ISOLIERROHR & METALL [DE], et al); | US4077098 [ ] (AYUSAWA SABURO, et al) |