EP0009310 - Compositions of vermiculite lamellae and solid particulate materials and process for the production of vermiculite articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1984 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1980/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ballard, Denis George Harold The Old Coach House 34a Tarvin Road Littleton, Chester / GB | 02 /
Meredith, William Neville Eugen 84 Ermin Road Hoole, Chester / GB | 03 /
Rideal, Graham Robin 9 Eaton Road Handbridge, Chester / GB | [1980/07] | Representative(s) | Oldroyd, Alan, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | Oldroyd, Alan, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | ||
Former [1980/07] | Bate, Bernard James Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents PO Box 6 Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 79301577.7 | 06.08.1979 | [1980/07] | Priority number, date | GB19330072378 | 17.08.1978 Original published format: GB 3372378 | [1980/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009310 | Date: | 02.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009310 | Date: | 08.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.12.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C04B31/26, C04B43/10 | [1983/23] | CPC: |
C04B30/00 (EP,US);
C04B14/208 (EP,US);
Y10S106/03 (EP,US);
Y10S428/92 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249986 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B30/00, C04B14/204, C04B14/30, C04B38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/07] | C04B31/26, C01B33/26, C04B43/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/07] | Title | German: | Mischungen von Vermiculitlamellen mit festen, teilchenförmigen Stoffen und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Vermiculitartikeln | [1980/07] | English: | Compositions of vermiculite lamellae and solid particulate materials and process for the production of vermiculite articles | [1980/07] | French: | Compositions de lamelles de vermiculite et de matériaux solides à grains fins et procédé de fabrication d'articles en vermiculite | [1980/07] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/19] | 20.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 06.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 15.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1983 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | GB1016385 [ ] (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG); | FR1463895 [ ]; | GB1119305 [ ] (GRACE W R & CO); | GB1202097 [ ] (MANDOVAL LTD [GB]); | DE1303249 [ ]; | DE2716152 [ ] (ICI LTD) | Examination | - CRC Handwork. Pages B65/66/94 |