EP0008238 - A multiplex information handling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARD & GOLDSTONE LIMITED Frederick Road Salford, M6 6AP / GB | [1980/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hampshire, Michael John 792 Halifax Road Liversedge West Yorkshire / GB | 02 /
Williamson, Jonathan Hugh 25 Westbourne Avenue Clifton, Swinton Manchester, M27 2NN / GB | [1980/04] | Representative(s) | Downey, William Gerrard, et al Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/04] | Downey, William Gerrard, et al Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw & Co., 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 79301636.1 | 13.08.1979 | [1980/04] | Priority number, date | GB19330057878 | 16.08.1978 Original published format: GB 3357878 | GB19330058578 | 16.08.1978 Original published format: GB 3358578 | GB19790003489 | 01.02.1979 Original published format: GB 7903489 | [1980/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0008238 | Date: | 20.02.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0008238 | Date: | 05.03.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0008238 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.12.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G08C15/00, B60R16/02, H04L7/04 | [1980/04] | CPC: |
H04L7/06 (EP);
G08C15/00 (EP);
H04J3/0614 (EP);
H04L7/044 (EP);
B60R16/0315 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/04] | Title | German: | Multiplexsystem zur Informationsverarbeitung | [1980/04] | English: | A multiplex information handling system | [1980/04] | French: | Système multiplex de traitement d'informations | [1980/04] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1980 | Examination requested [1980/23] | 06.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.02.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1982 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE1273563 [ ] (IBM); | [A]US3755628 (HUGHES I, et al); | DE2435579 [ ] (PLESSEY HANDEL INVESTMENT AG); | DE2433025 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | FR2350008 [ ] (NCR CO [US]); | [P]DE2801122 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) | [P] - RADIO ELEKTRONICA, May 1979, No. 9 Deventer, NL HINLOPEN: "Symposium auto-elektronicac pages 29-31. * Page 29, lines 1-8; page 30, left-hand columnlines 24-46; figure 5 * | [A] - FREQUENZ, Vol. 31, 1977, No. 12, Berlin DE ERDEL et al.: "Glasfaser-Bussysteme zur Signalubertragung in Bordnetzen" pages 364-368. * Pages 365 and 366; passage 3.2 page 368, left-hand columnlines 35-36 * |