EP0010347 - Novel substituted omega-aroyl(propionyl or butyryl)-L-prolines, pharmaceutical compositions containing them and processes for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.1984 [1984/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY Berdan Avenue Wayne New Jersey 06904 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/09] | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY Berdan Avenue Wayne New Jersey 06904 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McEvoy, Francis Joseph 107 Buchanan Street Pearl River, New York / US | 02 /
Albright, Jay Donald 5 Clifford Court Nanuet, New York / US | [1980/09] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | ||
Former [1980/09] | Allam, Peter Clerk LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 79301712.0 | 21.08.1979 | [1980/09] | Priority number, date | US19780939564 | 05.09.1978 Original published format: US 939564 | US19790044733 | 01.06.1979 Original published format: US 44733 | [1980/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010347 | Date: | 30.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010347 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/16, C07D403/12, A61K31/40 | [1980/09] | CPC: |
C07D207/46 (EP);
C07C327/00 (EP);
C07C59/84 (EP);
C07C59/88 (EP);
C07D207/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/09] | Title | German: | Substituierte Omega-Aroyl(propionyl oder butyryl)-L-proline, diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Verbindungen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1980/09] | English: | Novel substituted omega-aroyl(propionyl or butyryl)-L-prolines, pharmaceutical compositions containing them and processes for their preparation | [1980/09] | French: | Omega-aroyl(propionyl ou butyryl)-L-prolines substituées, compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant et procédés pour leur préparation | [1980/09] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/19] | 31.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2340933 [ ] (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | FR2372803 [ ] (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) |