EP0009930 - Recombinant DNA, method for preparing it and production of foreign proteins by unicellular hosts containing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.07.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Encina Hall 105 Stanford University Stanford, California 94305-1850 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/08] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Encina 105 Stanford University Stanford California 94305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nunber, Jack H. 4077 Amaranta Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
Chang, Annie C.Y. 765 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 03 /
Cohen, Stanley N. 271 Gabarda Way Portola Valley, California 94025 / US | 04 /
Schimke, Robert T. 639 Arastradero Road Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [1980/08] | Representative(s) | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London, WC2R 0AE / GB | ||
Former [1980/08] | Baldock, Hugh Charles Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London, WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302019.9 | 27.09.1979 | [1980/08] | Priority number, date | US19780950100 | 10.10.1978 Original published format: US 950100 | [1980/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009930 | Date: | 16.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009930 | Date: | 21.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0009930 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C07H21/04, // C12N9/02 | [1980/08] | CPC: |
C12N15/00 (EP);
C12N9/003 (EP);
C12Y105/01003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/08] | Title | German: | Rekombinante DNA, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Herstellung fremder Proteine durch einzellige Wirte, die sie enthalten | [1980/08] | English: | Recombinant DNA, method for preparing it and production of foreign proteins by unicellular hosts containing it | [1980/08] | French: | DNA recombinant, méthode pour sa préparation et production de protéines étrangères par des hôtes unicellulaires le contenant | [1980/08] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 20.11.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.01.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.04.1983
27.06.1983
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02
20.04.1983
27.06.1983
ADMISSIBLE F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Grenzacherstrasse 124 CH-4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Lederer, Franz, et al, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.04.1983
27.06.1983
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02
20.04.1983
27.06.1983
ADMISSIBLE F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Grenzacherstrasse 124 CH-4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Lederer, Franz, et al, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [1983/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.04.1983
27.06.1983
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02
20.04.1983
27.06.1983
ADMISSIBLE F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Grenzacherstrasse 124 CH-4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al, et al Vanderwerth, Lederer & Riederer Patentanwälte Lucile-Grahn-Strasse 22 D-8000 München 80 / DE | |||
Former [1983/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.04.1983
27.06.1983
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 28.06.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.01.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.01.1984 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.1984 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 13.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 13.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.11.1986 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 15.06.1987 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 15.06.1987 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - PROC, NATI. ACAD, SCI, U.S.A., Vol. 75, No. 8, August 1978, pages 3727-3731 LYDIA VILLA-KOMAROFF et al.: "A bacterial clone synthesizing proinsulin" * Pages 3728-3730: Results; figures 1,2 * | [ ] - NATURE, Vol. 275, 19th October 1978, pages 617-624 ANNIE C.Y. CHANG et al.: "Pheonotypic expression in E. coli of a DNA sequence coding for mouse dihydrofolate reductase" * Whole document * |