EP0009951 - A hot melt adhesive composition and a process for filling a cavity in a substrate with this composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1985 [1985/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard 40E St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | ||
Former [1980/08] | For all designated states THE MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, MO 63166 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donermeyer, Donald David 67 Moss Road Springfield Massachusetts 01119 / US | 02 /
Martins, Joseph Galvam 139 Bridle Path Circle Ludlow Massachusetts 01056 / US | [1980/08] | Representative(s) | Pearson, John Lionel, et al Monsanto Europe S.A. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No 1 1150 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/08] | Pearson, John Lionel, et al Monsanto Europe S.A. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No 1 B-1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 79302056.1 | 01.10.1979 | [1980/08] | Priority number, date | US19780948379 | 04.10.1978 Original published format: US 948379 | US19780948380 | 04.10.1978 Original published format: US 948380 | [1980/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009951 | Date: | 16.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009951 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/06, C09J3/16, C08L67/02, C08L77/00, C08L77/12 | [1980/08] | CPC: |
C09J177/12 (EP);
C08G63/672 (EP);
C08K3/10 (EP);
C08K3/34 (EP);
C08K3/40 (EP);
C09D5/34 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/10, C08L67/02 (EP);
C08K3/34, C08L67/02 (EP);
C08K3/40, C08L67/02 (EP);
C09J167/02, C08L2666/54 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1980/08] | Title | German: | Heissschmelzklebstoff-Zusammensetzung und Verfahren zum Füllen eines Hohlraums in einem Substrat mit dieser Zusammensetzung | [1980/08] | English: | A hot melt adhesive composition and a process for filling a cavity in a substrate with this composition | [1980/08] | French: | Composition adhésive fusible à chaud et procédé pour remplir une cavité dans un substrat avec cet adhésif | [1980/08] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1980 | Examination requested [1980/18] | 23.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3907733 [ ]; | DE1930461 [ ]; | FR2339661 [ ]; | US4004960 [ ]; | US4053682 [ ] |