EP0010427 - Transformer cores [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1986 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1987 [1987/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manderson, Laurence Rex 1/77 Benson Street Toowong Queensland, 4066 / AU | For all designated states Manderson, Susan Valerie 1/77 Benson Street Toowong Queensland, 4066 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1980/09] | For all designated states Manderson, Laurence Rex 1/77 Benson Street Toowong Queensland, 4066 / AU | ||
For all designated states Manderson, Susan Valerie 1/77 Benson Street Toowong Queensland, 4066 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manderson, Laurence Rex 1/77 Benson Street Toowong Queensland, 4066 / AU | [1980/09] | Representative(s) | Collingwood, Anthony Robert, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester, M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | Collingwood, Anthony Robert, et al GEORGE FUERY & COMPANY Whitehall Chambers 23 Colmore Row Birmingham B3 2BL / GB | ||
Former [1981/01] | Collingwood, Anthony Robert GEORGE FUERY & COMPANY Whitehall Chambers 23 Colmore Row Birmingham B3 2BL / GB | ||
Former [1980/09] | Collingwood, Anthony Robert GEORGE FUERY & COMPANY Whitehall Chambers 23 Colmore Row Birmingham B3 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302237.7 | 17.10.1979 | [1980/09] | Priority number, date | AU19780006472 | 19.10.1978 Original published format: AU 647278 | [1980/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010427 | Date: | 30.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010427 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/02, H01F27/24, B65H39/00 | [1980/16] | CPC: |
H01F41/0213 (EP);
H01F27/25 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1980/09] | H01F41/02, H01F27/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1980/09] | Title | German: | Transformatorkerne | [1980/09] | English: | Transformer cores | [1980/09] | French: | Noyaux de transformateur | [1980/09] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 22.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB524285 [ ]; | DE691531 [ ]; | GB692845 [ ]; | GB708995 [ ]; | US2458112 [ ]; | DE1011056 [ ]; | GB662915 [ ]; | DE2702455 [ ]; | FR2287760 [ ]; | GB830094 [ ]; | FR1107583 [ ]; | FR1333285 [ ]; | US2366071 [ ] |