EP0010946 - A water faucet and attachment therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.01.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raz, Zeev, Dr. 17 Keren Hayessod St. Beer Sheva / IL | For all designated states BEN-GURION UNIVERSITY OF THE NEGEV RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY P.O. Box 1025 Beer-Sheva / IL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | For all designated states Raz, Zeev, Dr. 17 Keren Hayessod St. Beer Sheva / IL | ||
For all designated states BEN-GURION UNIVERSITY OF THE NEGEV RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY P.O. Box 1025 Beer-Sheva / IL | |||
Former [1980/10] | For all designated states Raz, Zeev, Dr. 17 Keren Hayessod St. Beer Sheva / IL | ||
For all designated states BEN-GURION UNIVERSITY OF THE NEGEV RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY P.O.Box 1025 Beer Sheva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raz, Zeev, Dr. 17 Keren Hayessod St. Beer Sheva / IL | [1980/10] | Representative(s) | Hind, Raymond Stenton, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Lyon House Lyon Road Harrow, Middlesex, HA1 2ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | Hind, Raymond Stenton, et al Mathisen, Macara & Co. Lyon House Lyon Road Harrow, Middlesex, HA1 2ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302369.8 | 30.10.1979 | [1980/10] | Priority number, date | IL19840000558 | 06.11.1978 Original published format: IL 55884 | [1980/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010946 | Date: | 14.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04 | [1980/10] | CPC: |
F16K19/00 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87684 (EP,US);
Y10T137/88102 (EP,US);
Y10T137/9464 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/10] | Title | German: | Wasserhahn und Anschluss dafür | [1980/10] | English: | A water faucet and attachment therefor | [1980/10] | French: | Robinet d'eau et son raccordement | [1980/10] | File destroyed: | 01.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 10.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/03] | 02.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1986/12] | 26.10.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1986/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1985 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1790625 [ ]; | US2181630 [ ] (LUIGI TADDEO); | US2504610 [ ] (WOLF RICHARD H); | US2528272 [ ] (GILMAN MORRIS A); | US2576414 [ ] (PETERSON HARRY R B); | US2607598 [ ] (MACK ALBERT C); | US2623752 [ ] (WENTZ GEORGE W, et al); | DE1007255 [ ] (JESSE G JOHNS); | US3168113 [ ] (MCJOHNSON OTIS S) |