EP0010949 - Semiconductor laser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.1984 [1984/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scifres, Donald R. 1337 Montclair Way Los Altos, California 94022 / US | 02 /
Streifer, William 263 Fairfield Ct. Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
Burnham, Robert D. 26343 Esperanza Dr. Los Altos Hills, California 94022 / US | [1980/10] | Representative(s) | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | [1983/52] |
Former [1981/36] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1980/10] | Goode, Ian Roy Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302373.0 | 30.10.1979 | [1980/10] | Priority number, date | US19780956307 | 30.10.1978 Original published format: US 956307 | [1980/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0010949 | Date: | 14.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0010949 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010949 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/06, H01S3/19, // H01S3/23 | [1980/10] | CPC: |
H01S5/4068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1980/10] | Title | German: | Halbleiterlaser | [1980/10] | English: | Semiconductor laser | [1980/10] | French: | Laser à semiconducteur | [1980/10] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/02] | 20.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 08.01.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3514715 (KOSONOCKY WALTER F); | [A]US3701044 (PAOLI THOMAS LEE, et al) | [P] - APPLIED PHYS. LETT., Vol. 33, No. 12, December 1978, pages 1015-1017 New York, U.S.A. D.R. SCIFRES et al.: "Phase-locked semiconductor laser array". | [A] - RCA TECHNICAL NOTES, RCATN, No. 76, April 1968, Princeton, U.S.A. JACQUES I. PANKOVE: "Integrated phase coherent laser array". |