EP0011470 - Stair mat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.1984 [1984/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Naka Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1020-178 Hassamu, Nishi-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | [1980/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naka, Hiromitsu c/o Tokyo Kenkyusho of Kabushiki Kaisha Naka Gijutsu Kenkyusho No. 39 Oaza Shinmachi Yashio-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1980/11] | Representative(s) | Smith, Martin Stanley, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/11] | Smith, Martin Stanley, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302539.6 | 12.11.1979 | [1980/11] | Priority number, date | JP19780155063U | 13.11.1978 Original published format: JP 15506378 U | JP19790020283U | 21.02.1979 Original published format: JP 2028379 U | JP19790021763U | 23.02.1979 Original published format: JP 2176379 U | [1980/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011470 | Date: | 28.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011470 | Date: | 13.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/16, A47G27/02 | [1980/11] | CPC: |
E04F11/166 (EP,US);
Y10T428/19 (EP,US);
Y10T428/195 (EP,US);
Y10T428/198 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24008 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2457 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/11] | Title | German: | Treppenstufenbelag | [1980/11] | English: | Stair mat | [1980/11] | French: | Revêtement de marches d'escalier | [1980/11] | File destroyed: | 05.09.1996 | Examination procedure | 20.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/05] | 16.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2418722 [ ] (ROBBINS JUN); | GB108413 [ ] (FROOD HERBERT); | DE1560671 [ ]; | GB1173138 [ ] (THRUPP & MABERLY LTD [GB]); | DE7835692U [ ] |