EP0011495 - Method and apparatus for rotating an information storage disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 27.05.1989 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1989 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 12.07.1989 [1989/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DISCOVISION ASSOCIATES 2183 Fairview Road Suite 211 Costa Mesa California 92627 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | For all designated states DISCOVISION ASSOCIATES 2183 Fairview Road Suite 211 Costa Mesa California 92627 / US | ||
Former [1982/02] | For all designated states DISCOVISION ASSOCIATES P.O. Box 6600 3300 Hyland Avenue Costa Mesa California 92626 / US | ||
Former [1980/11] | For all designated states MCA DISCOVISION, INC. 100, Universal City Plaza Universal City California 91608 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dakin, Wayne Ray 816, Camino Real 204, Redondo Beach California 90277 / US | 02 /
Ceshkovsky, Ludwig 10435, Morning Glory Avenue Fountain Valley California 92708 / US | [1980/11] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | Raynor, John, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | ||
Former [1980/11] | Arthur, George Fitzgerald KILBURN & STRODE 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302594.1 | 15.11.1979 | [1980/11] | Priority number, date | US19780961405 | 16.11.1978 Original published format: US 961405 | [1980/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011495 | Date: | 28.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011495 | Date: | 12.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/37] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0011495 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G11B19/24 | [1980/11] | CPC: |
G11B19/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zum Antreiben einer Informationsspeicherplatte | [1980/11] | English: | Method and apparatus for rotating an information storage disc | [1980/11] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour commander la rotation d'un disque d'enregistrement d'information | [1980/11] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 29.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.1985
31.07.1985
ADMISSIBLE Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Beckers, Hubertus Franciscus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.1985
31.07.1985
ADMISSIBLE Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Beckers, Hubertus Franciscus Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 01.08.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.11.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.01.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 07.03.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 19.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 10.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.01.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.04.1989 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2208161 [ ] (IBM [US]); | DE2521821 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | US4079942 [ ] (KUNEN SCOTT M); | DE2811761 [ ] (LEPPER WILHELM DR ING) |