EP0011983 - Regenerative rotodynamic machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/12] | Improvements in or relating to regenerative rotodynamic machines | ||
[1982/21] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 24.11.1986 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.1986 | Opposition rejected | published on 14.01.1987 [1987/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAIR INDUSTRIAL LIMITED P.O. Box 44 Reavell Works Ranelagh Road Ipswich IP2 0AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states CompAir Industrial Limited P.O. Box 44 Reavell Works Ranelagh Road Ipswich IP2 0AE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sixsmith, Herbert 69 Hamilton Road Oxford / GB | 02 /
Thurlow, Keith Harkstead Nr. Ipswich / GB | 03 /
Soar, Geoffrey Keith Vine Cottage, Alton Green Lower Holbrook, Ipswich / GB | 04 /
Burton, James W. 17 The Limes Rushmere, Ipswich / GB | [1980/12] | Representative(s) | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302651.9 | 21.11.1979 | [1980/12] | Priority number, date | GB19460041978 | 28.11.1978 Original published format: GB 4641978 | [1980/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011983 | Date: | 11.06.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011983 | Date: | 26.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F04D5/00, F04D23/00 | [1980/12] | CPC: |
F04D5/005 (EP,US);
F04D23/008 (EP,US);
F04D29/161 (EP,US);
F04D29/188 (EP,US);
F04D5/002 (EP,US);
F04D5/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/12] | Title | German: | Drehende Seitenkanalmaschine | [1980/12] | English: | Regenerative rotodynamic machines | [1982/21] | French: | Machine rotative à canal latéral | [1980/12] |
Former [1980/12] | Improvements in or relating to regenerative rotodynamic machines | Examination procedure | 02.08.1980 | Examination requested [1980/22] | 30.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.01.1983
23.02.1983
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.01.1983
23.02.1983
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 31.03.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.08.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.10.1983 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1983 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 13.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 30.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 01.07.1986 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 11.07.1986 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1987/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB606127 [ ] (BENDIX AVIAT CORP); | FR980254 [ ]; | DE868957 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | US3558236 [ ] (BYLSMA SIMON); | US3560104 [ ] (NEALE ABAS BEAUCAN); | FR2051818 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC); | DE2125042 [ ]; | GB1402713 [ ] (LINTOTT ENG LTD); | US3989411 [ ] (MIDDLETON ANDREW HENRY); | FR2338376 [ ] (RATEAU SA [FR]) |