EP0013480 - Herbicidal pyridinesulfonamides, preparation and use thereof and compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/15] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levitt, George 3218 Romilly Road Cardiff Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | [1980/15] | Representative(s) | Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/15] | Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302769.9 | 03.12.1979 | [1980/15] | Priority number, date | US19780966258 | 04.12.1978 Original published format: US 966258 | US19790083753 | 22.10.1979 Original published format: US 83753 | [1980/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0013480 | Date: | 23.07.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0013480 | Date: | 12.11.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013480 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/36, C07D401/12, // C07D213/71 | [1980/15] | CPC: |
C07D521/00 (EP);
A01N47/36 (EP);
C07D213/71 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1980/15] | Title | German: | Pyridinsulfonamide mit herbizider Wirkung, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung und diese enthaltende Zusammensetzungen | [1980/15] | English: | Herbicidal pyridinesulfonamides, preparation and use thereof and compositions containing them | [1980/15] | French: | Pyridinesulfonamides à activité herbicide, leur préparation et utilisation et compositions les contenant | [1980/15] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/28] | 06.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.09.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP81201190.6 / EP0049554 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2715786 [ ] (DU PONT) |