EP0012601 - A method and an apparatus for removing waste from the area below machinery and a carding engine provided with such means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.1982 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crosrol Limited Pellon Lane Halifax HX1 5QG West Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/13] | For all designated states Crosrol Limited Pellon Lane Halifax HX1 5QG West Yorkshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carstairs, Michael 92 Waterloo Road Huddersfield West Yorkshire / GB | 02 /
Griffiths, George Edwin 19 Yew Trees Avenue Northowram Halifax West Yorkshire / GB | [1980/13] | Representative(s) | Geldard, David Guthrie, et al URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds, LS2 8PB West Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/13] | Geldard, David Guthrie, et al URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds, LS2 8PB West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302861.4 | 12.12.1979 | [1980/13] | Priority number, date | GB19480043578 | 14.12.1978 Original published format: GB 4843578 | [1980/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0012601 | Date: | 25.06.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B08B5/00, D01G15/82 | [1980/13] | CPC: |
B08B5/00 (EP);
D01G15/825 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT [1980/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zum Abführen von Abfall von der unter einer Maschine befindlichen Zone und eine solche Mittel aufweisende Karde | [1980/13] | English: | A method and an apparatus for removing waste from the area below machinery and a carding engine provided with such means | [1980/13] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour évacuer des déchets de la zone située en dessous d'une machine, et une cardeuse équipée de tels moyens | [1980/13] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 30.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/02] | 22.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1982/40] | 26.06.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1981 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2383858 [ ]; | FR1575318 [ ]; | GB562740 [ ] |