EP0017688 - Monolithic integrated circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/22] | A memory system and quiet column decoder therefor | ||
[1988/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1992 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 4350 East Camelback Road Suite 200F Phoenix, Arizona 85018 / US | [1980/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moench, Jerry Dale 11305 Spicewood Parkway Austin, Texas 78750 / US | [1980/22] | Representative(s) | Newens, Leonard Eric, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & CO. 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | Newens, Leonard Eric, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & CO. 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302922.4 | 17.12.1979 | [1980/22] | Priority number, date | US19790019990 | 12.03.1979 Original published format: US 19990 | [1980/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0017688 | Date: | 29.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0017688 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G11C8/00, G11C11/24 | [1980/22] | CPC: |
G11C8/10 (EP,US);
G11C11/4087 (EP,US);
G11C11/418 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/22] | Title | German: | Monolithische integrierte Schaltung | [1988/03] | English: | Monolithic integrated circuit | [1988/03] | French: | Circuit intégré monolithique | [1988/03] |
Former [1980/22] | Speichersystem und störfreie Spalten-Dekodierschaltung dafür | ||
Former [1980/22] | A memory system and quiet column decoder therefor | ||
Former [1980/22] | Système de mémoire et décodeur silencieux de colonne y relatif | Examination procedure | 06.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 06.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 09.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 08.06.1983 | Appeal received No. T0123/83 | 08.06.1983 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.06.1985 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1985/24] | 25.07.1985 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1985/30] | 13.08.1986 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1986/33] | 02.10.1986 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1986/40] | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3906463 [ ] (YU ROBERT TAPEI); | US3560940 [ ] (GAENSSLEN FRITZ H); | US4194130 [ ] (MOENCH JERRY D [US]); | US4042915 [ ] (REED JOHN A); | US3576548 [ ] (WATSON GEORGE A); | US3611437 [ ] (VARADI ANDREW G, et al); | US4156938 [ ] (PROEBSTING ROBERT J [US], et al); | DE2658655 [ ] (MOSTEK CORP); | US4099162 [ ] (VON BASSE PAUL-WERNER); | US4057787 [ ] (HEUER DALE A, et al); | US4104735 [ ] (HOFMANN RUEDIGER, et al); | US4104733 [ ] (SATOH TAKASHI); | US4087704 [ ] (MEHTA RUSTAM J, et al); | US3969706 [ ] (PROEBSTING ROBERT JAMES, et al); | US3848237 [ ] (GEILHUFE M, et al); | US3909808 [ ] (COCHRAN WILLIAM HUGH, et al) | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol. 18, No. 10, May 1976, pages 3955-3956 Armonk, U.S.A. PARIKH: "High-Speed FET Decoder". |