EP0003706 - Multipoint time division digital transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAT (Société Anonyme de Télécommunications), Société Anonyme 6 Avenue d'Iéna 75783 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brouard, Germain Guy 11, allée La Fontaine F-91410 Dourdan / FR | 02 /
Molleron, Claude Auguste 4, rue Antoine Petit F-92260 Fontenay-aux-Roses / FR | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Martinet, René, et al Cabinet Martinet 62, rue des Mathurins F-75008 Paris / FR | [1981/43] |
Former [1981/43] | Martinet, René Cabinet Martinet 62, rue des Mathurins F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 79400080.2 | 06.02.1979 | Priority number, date | FR19780003391 | 07.02.1978 Original published format: FR 7803391 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003706 | Date: | 22.08.1979 | Language: | FR | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003706 | Date: | 28.10.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H04L11/00 | [1981/43] | CPC: |
H04L12/525 (EP,US);
H04M3/561 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Zeitmultiplex- Datenübertragungssystem mit Vielfachverbindungseinrichtungen | English: | Multipoint time division digital transmission system | French: | Système de transmission numérique multipoint à division du temps | Examination procedure | 02.11.1979 | Examination requested [1980/01] | 30.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.04.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1981 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.03.1981 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 28.02.1982 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | FR2324184 [ ] (DAVANCENS MICHEL [FR]); | FR2346915 [ ] (TEXIER ALAIN [FR]) | [ ] - INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM, volume 2, 1976, 25-29 octobre 1976, Kyoto, Japon, Tokyo. M. DAVANCENS et J.P. GUENIN: "An Experimental Data Switching Exchange"pages 412-4-1 À 4-8. | [ ] - INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM, volume 2, 1976, 25-29 octobre 1976, Kyoto, Japon, Tokyo, M. CHIBA et al.: "A Commercial Test of Digital Data Networks and its future survey"pages 441-1-1 à 1-6. | [ ] - TELETECHNIK, 1975, volume 19, no. 1-2, Aarhus. A.SOGAARD: "New Automatic Multiaddress Telex Call Equipment in the Danish Telex Network"pages 7 à 15. | [ ] - THE BELL SYSTEM TECHNICAL JOURNAL, volume 54, no. 5, mai-juin 1975. New York. N. SNOW et N. KNAPP: "Digital Data System", SYSTEM OVERVIEWpages 811 à 832. |