EP0005086 - Garment collar strengthening fabric, process for its manufacture and process for manufacturing a collar containing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.1980 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faviere, Michel Ancienne Scierie Quincey F-70000 Vesoul / FR | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Chenard, René Marcel Cabinet BUGNION ASSOCIES 116, boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79400099.2 | 16.02.1979 | Priority number, date | FR19780004997 | 16.02.1978 Original published format: FR 7804997 | FR19780004998 | 16.02.1978 Original published format: FR 7804998 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005086 | Date: | 31.10.1979 | Language: | FR | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1979 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/12, D03D11/00, A41D27/06, A41B3/10, D06M17/00 | CPC: |
A41D27/06 (EP);
D06M17/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Stoff zum Stärken von Kleiderkragen, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kragens aus diesem Stoff | English: | Garment collar strengthening fabric, process for its manufacture and process for manufacturing a collar containing it | French: | Tissu pour renfort de cols de vêtements, son procédé de fabrication et procédé de fabrication d'un col le comportant | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 07.11.1979 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.162(4) [1980/13] | 18.01.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1980/13] | 05.02.1980 | Request for conversion into a national application, for BE/CH/DE/GB/IT/NL/SE [1980/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH198387 [ ]; | DE1610658 [ ]; | CH312716 [ ]; | US2377933 [ ] |