EP0004490 - Reversing drive mechanism for washing machines, and machine equipped with such a mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/40] | Reversing drive mechanism, especially for washing machines, and machine equipped with such a mechanism | ||
[1981/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. 21260 Selongey / FR | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwob, Pierre 55 Avenue des Frères Lumière F-69008 Lyon / FR | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Bouju, André Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/40] | Bouju, André Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 F-75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 79400124.8 | 27.02.1979 | Priority number, date | FR19780008518 | 23.03.1978 Original published format: FR 7808518 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0004490 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0004490 | Date: | 03.10.1979 | Language: | FR | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004490 | Date: | 07.10.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | D06F17/08, F16H5/70, D06F37/34 | [1981/40] | CPC: |
F16H3/145 (EP,US);
D06F17/08 (EP);
D06F34/08 (EP,US);
D06F37/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Drehrichtungsumsteuervorrichtung für Waschmaschinen, und mit einer solchen Vorrichtung ausgestattete Maschine | [1981/40] | English: | Reversing drive mechanism for washing machines, and machine equipped with such a mechanism | [1981/40] | French: | Mécanisme d'inversion de marche pour machine à laver, et machine équipée d'un tel mécanisme | [1981/41] |
Former [1981/40] | Drehrichtungsumsteuervorrichtung, insbesondere für Waschmaschinen, und mit einer solchen Vorrichtung ausgestattete Maschine | ||
Former [1981/40] | Reversing drive mechanism, especially for washing machines, and machine equipped with such a mechanism | ||
Former [1981/40] | Mécanisme d'inversion de marche, notamment pour machine à laver, et machine équipée d'un tel mécanisme | Examination procedure | 09.10.1979 | Examination requested | 31.03.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.04.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR407427 (ALVA JOSIAH FISHER [US]); | [A]US1358295 (CORLETT ROBERT S); | [A]US1628233 (ALEXANDER DANIEL); | [A]FR520719 (APEX ELECTRICAL MFG CO [US]); | [A]NL16618C ; | [A]US1414430 (MAMMEN LAWRENCE W); | [A]US1632091 (MITCHELL HARRY W); | [A]FR735447 ; | [A]US1755026 (SCHMITT JOSEPH J); | [A]US1396082 (WOOD JAMES J); | [A]US2709727 (DRESSEL HENRY M); | [A]CH139302 (SCHLEICHER KARL [DE]) |