EP0004816 - Sizing process, glass fibres thus obatined and their use for reinforcing plastic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/19] | Sizing composition, glass fibres treated with this composition and their use for reinforcing plastic materials | ||
[1984/29] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.01.1985 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1985 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 20.03.1985 [1985/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN INDUSTRIES 62, Bd Victor Hugo 92209 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Droux, Michel 462 Rue Clémenceau F-73490 La Ravoire / FR | 02 /
Bocquet, Gilbert "Villa Maria" 486 Chemin sous bois F-73190 Challes-Les-Eaux / FR | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Eudes, Marcel, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93304 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | Eudes, Marcel, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc F-93304 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1982/19] | Eudes, Marcel SOFAB, 4, rue Diderot F-92156 Suresnes Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 79400211.3 | 02.04.1979 | Priority number, date | FR19780009726 | 03.04.1978 Original published format: FR 7809726 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0004816 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0004816 | Date: | 17.10.1979 | Language: | FR | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004816 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/19] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0004816 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/02, C08J5/24, D06M15/00 | [1982/19] | CPC: |
C03C25/26 (EP,US);
C08J5/248 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2938 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Schlichte-Verfahren, daraus gewonnene Glasfasern und deren Verwendung zur Verstärkung von plastischen Materialien | [1984/32] | English: | Sizing process, glass fibres thus obatined and their use for reinforcing plastic materials | [1984/29] | French: | Procédé d'ensimage, fibres de verre obtenues et leur utilisation pour le renforcement de matières plastiques | [1984/29] |
Former [1982/19] | Schlichtemittelzusammensetzung, Glasfasern behandelt mit dieser Zusammensetzung und deren Verwendung zur Verstärkung von plastischen Materialien | ||
Former [1982/19] | Sizing composition, glass fibres treated with this composition and their use for reinforcing plastic materials | ||
Former [1982/19] | Composition d'ensimage, fibres de verre traitées à l'aide de cette composition et leur utilisation pour le renforcement de matières plastiques | Examination procedure | 11.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/14] | 23.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.10.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.1983
18.03.1983
ADMISSIBLE Chemische Fabrik Pfersee GmbH Rehlinger Str. 1 D-86462 Langweid a. Lech / DE | 02
09.02.1983
18.03.1983
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.1983
18.03.1983
ADMISSIBLE Chemische Fabrik Pfersee GmbH Rehlinger Str. 1 D-86462 Langweid a. Lech / DE | ||
02
09.02.1983
18.03.1983
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 18.03.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.07.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.08.1984 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.11.1984 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB802549 (GEN ANILINE & FILM CORP); | GB919318 [ ] (PITTSBURGH PLATE GLASS CO); | FR1490767 [ ] (DOWSMITH INC); | [D]FR2110469 (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP); | [A]FR2186440 (JOHNS MANVILLE [US]); | [D]FR2340389 (BASF AG [DE]); | EP0000683 [ ] (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) |