EP0005096 - Millimeter wave source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/50] | Millimeter wave source and transmitter comprising such a source | ||
[1981/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/21] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, boulevard Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cédex 08 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cachier, Gérard "THOMSON CSF"-SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Stevance, Jean "THOMSON-CSF"-SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Giraud, Pierre, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann 75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/50] | Giraud, Pierre, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 79400216.2 | 03.04.1979 | Priority number, date | FR19780011059 | 14.04.1978 Original published format: FR 7811059 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005096 | Date: | 31.10.1979 | Language: | FR | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005096 | Date: | 16.12.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H03B7/14 | [1981/50] | CPC: |
H03B7/143 (EP,US);
H03C3/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/50] | H04B1/04, H03B7/14 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Millimeterwellenquelle | [1981/50] | English: | Millimeter wave source | [1981/50] | French: | Source d'ondes millimétriques | [1981/50] |
Former [1981/50] | Quelle für Millimeterwellen und Sender mit einer solchen Quelle | ||
Former [1981/50] | Millimeter wave source and transmitter comprising such a source | ||
Former [1981/50] | Source d'ondes millimétriques et émetteur comportant une telle source | Examination procedure | 19.09.1979 | Examination requested | 28.01.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 25.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3996529 [ ] (CURTICE WALTER RICHARD); | US3659222 [ ] (ASSOUR JACQUES MAYER, et al); | FR2348574 [ ] (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | US3465265 [ ] (KURU ISAMU); | FR2183016 [ ] (VARIAN ASSOCIATES [US]); | US3524149 [ ] (SOCCI ROBERT J) | [ ] - INTERELECTRONIQUE, No. 232, 31 Janvier 1977, Paris DELLA MUSSIA: "L'integration gagne les composants hyperfrequences millimetriques", pages 19-22. * Page 20, ligne 4 - page 22, colonne du milieuderniere ligne * | [ ] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, Vol. 24, No. 10, Octobre 1976 New York JOHNSON: "Posttuning Drift of a Transferred-Electron-Device Voltage-Controlled Oscillator", pages 650-656. * Page 651, colonne de droitelignes 1-13; figure 3 * | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol. 8, No. 8, Janvier 1966, New York FLEMING: "Electronic FM Modulation of GaAs Oscillator"page 1077. * En entier * |