EP0005115 - Detachable mouth piece serving as a device for hygienically drinking from a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/50] | Detachable mouth piece serving as a device for drinking from a container | ||
[1981/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lang, Ludwig Zimmerstrasse 10-12 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | For all designated states Lang, Ortulf Götz Zimmerstrasse 10-12 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Haenle, Karl (deceased) 28.07.1984 / DE | [1981/50] | Application number, filing date | 79400249.3 | 18.04.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782817199 | 20.04.1978 Original published format: DE 2817199 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005115 | Date: | 31.10.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005115 | Date: | 16.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B65D25/48 | [1981/50] | CPC: |
B65D25/48 (EP,US);
B65D2517/0049 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Lösbar-festes Mundstück als Vorrichtung zum hygienischen Trinken aus einem Behälter | [1981/50] | English: | Detachable mouth piece serving as a device for hygienically drinking from a container | [1981/50] | French: | Goulotte amovible utilisée pour boire d'une manière hygiénique le contenu d'un récipient | [1981/50] |
Former [1981/50] | Lösbar-festes Mundstück als Vorrichtung zum Trinken aus einem Behälter | ||
Former [1981/50] | Detachable mouth piece serving as a device for drinking from a container | ||
Former [1981/50] | Goulotte amovible utilisée pour boire le contenu d'un récipient | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/15] | 20.08.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.06.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1981 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.1981 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.12.1981 | SE | 16.12.1981 | LU | 30.04.1982 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/52] | IT | 16.12.1981 | |
SE | 16.12.1981 | ||
LU | 30.04.1982 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 16.12.1981 | |
SE | 16.12.1981 | ||
Former [1982/31] | SE | 16.12.1981 | Documents cited: | Search | US3863820 [ ] (WHARTON FRANKLIN EUGENE); | DE1906686 [ ] (ROHRBACH BERND); | GB214856 [ ] (RICHARD ROBERTS); | US2171094 [ ] (JOSEPH LIVOTI) |