EP0005399 - Pneumatic safety tyre [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PNEUMATIQUES, CAOUTCHOUC, MANUFACTURE ET PLASTIQUES KLEBER-COLOMBES Société anonyme dite: Place de Valmy 92700 Colombes / FR | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deck, Alphonse 4 ter, rue des Vertugadins F-92190 Meudon / FR | 02 /
Lefaucheur, Claude 173, rue de Charenton F-75012 Paris / FR | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Chevallier, René, et al 6 Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | [1982/19] | Application number, filing date | 79400275.8 | 27.04.1979 | Priority number, date | FR19780013891 | 10.05.1978 Original published format: FR 7813891 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005399 | Date: | 14.11.1979 | Language: | FR | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005399 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B60C17/00, B60C13/00, B60C7/12 | [1982/19] | CPC: |
B60C13/00 (EP,US);
B60C17/0009 (EP,US);
B60C17/0027 (EP,US);
B60C9/0207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Sicherheits-Luftreifen | English: | Pneumatic safety tyre | French: | Pneumatique de sécurité | Examination procedure | 15.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/07] | 29.12.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1358308 [ ] (GILMORE GEORGE E); | US3207200 [ ] (ROGER BOUSSU GABRIEL XAVIER, et al); | FR2201981 [ ] (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD [JP]); | FR2206200 [ ] (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD [JP]); | FR2268657 [ ] (FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO [US]); | FR2287350 [ ] (GOODRICH CO B F [US]); | FR2350973 [ ] (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) |