EP0005673 - Metallic multilayered substrate for the absorption of solar radiation and process for realising such a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.1982 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.1982 [1982/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vironneau, Pierre René Chemin des Palanques F-31120 Portet-Sur-Garonne / FR | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Fruchard, Guy, et al NOVAPAT-CABINET CHEREAU 107, Boulevard Péreire F-75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79400310.3 | 16.05.1979 | Priority number, date | FR19780015665 | 22.05.1978 Original published format: FR 7815665 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0005673 | Date: | 28.11.1979 | Language: | FR | [N/P] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0005673 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F24J3/02 | CPC: |
C25D5/14 (EP,US);
F24S70/225 (EP,US);
C25D5/611 (EP,US);
C25D5/617 (EP,US);
C25D5/623 (EP,US);
C25D5/627 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Mehrschichtiges metallisches Substrat zur Absorption von Sonnenstrahlen und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen Substrats | English: | Metallic multilayered substrate for the absorption of solar radiation and process for realising such a substrate | French: | Substrat métallique multicouches absorbeur des radiations solaires et procédé de réalisation d'un tel substrat | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 09.06.1980 | Examination requested [1980/18] | 21.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1982/17] | 12.12.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1981 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2266753 (NASA [US]); | [A]US4055707 (MCDONALD GLEN E) |