EP0006054 - Acoustic surface wave filter and intermediate frequency stage for a television receiver comprising same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.12.1983 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/21] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, boulevard Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cédex 08 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coussot, Gérard "THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Menager, Olivier "THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 03 /
Van Den Driessche, Michel "THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Desperrier, Jean-Louis, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79400330.1 | 23.05.1979 | Priority number, date | FR19780016868 | 06.06.1978 Original published format: FR 7816868 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006054 | Date: | 12.12.1979 | Language: | FR | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/26, H04N9/32 | CPC: |
H03H9/1452 (EP,US);
H03H9/0028 (EP,US);
H03H9/02637 (EP,US);
H03H9/14552 (EP,US);
H03H9/14591 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Filter für akustische Oberflächenwellen und Zwischenfrequenzstufe für Fernsehempfänger mit solch einem Filter | English: | Acoustic surface wave filter and intermediate frequency stage for a television receiver comprising same | French: | Filtre à ondes élastiques de surface et étage de fréquence intermédiaire d'un récepteur de télévision comprenant un tel filtre | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 02.11.1979 | Examination requested [1980/02] | 08.02.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 11.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1984/08] | 28.10.1983 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1984/08] | Appeal following examination | 16.12.1981 | Appeal received No. T0070/82 | 13.02.1982 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.11.1982 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1982/45] | 07.01.1983 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1983/02] | 02.09.1983 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1983/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3626309 [ ] (KNOWLES TERENCE JOHN); | FR2138105 [ ] (PHILIPS NV); | GB1433398 [ ] (MULLARD LTD) | [ ] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, Vol. 8, No. 19, 21 Septembre 1972; London (GB) LA ROSA et al.: "Broadband Bulk Wave Cancellation in acoustic Surface Wave Devices", pages 478-479. * Figure 1c; pages 478-479le paragraphe; "Cancellation Scheme" * |