EP0007849 - Remote control device for actuating an external rear-view mirror from the inside of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.1981 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manzoni-Bouchot Société anonyme dite: Zone Industrielle "Le Plan d'Acier" Boîte Postale No 9 F-39200 Saint-Claude / FR | [1980/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manzoni, Stéphane 1, rue Pasteur F-39200 Saint-Claude / FR | [1980/03] | Representative(s) | Moulines, Pierre, et al Cabinet BEAU de LOMENIE 55, rue d'Amsterdam 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/03] | Moulines, Pierre, et al Cabinet BEAU de LOMENIE 55, rue d'Amsterdam F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 79400489.5 | 11.07.1979 | [1980/03] | Priority number, date | FR19780021303 | 18.07.1978 Original published format: FR 7821303 | FR19780035837 | 20.12.1978 Original published format: FR 7835837 | [1980/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0007849 | Date: | 06.02.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/06 | [1980/03] | CPC: |
B60R1/068 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20432 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1980/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Fernbedienen eines von innen verstellbaren Aussenrückspiegels für Fahrzeuge | [1980/03] | English: | Remote control device for actuating an external rear-view mirror from the inside of a vehicle | [1980/03] | French: | Dispositif de commande à distance pour rétroviseur extérieur réglable de l'intérieur d'un véhicule | [1980/03] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 06.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/11] | 26.08.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.03.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2074884 [ ] (CASCO PRODUCTS CORP); | FR2160754 [ ] (CASCO PRODUCTS CORP); | FR2326614 [ ] (LUKEY LEONARD [AU]); | US3625085 [ ] (SHRODE WILFORD B); | US3838608 [ ] (HADLEY R); | FR2347231 [ ] (KOOT IND BV [NL]); | FR1529477 [ ] (LEE RADKE ASSOCIATES) |