EP0007876 - Capsule for a product dose and method for distributing the dose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.1981 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE GENERALE POUR L'EMBALLAGE 7, rue Eugène-Flachat F-75849 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [1980/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lagneaux, Jean Les Hautes Gouttes - Graix F-42220 Bourg Argental / FR | [1980/03] | Representative(s) | Eudes, Marcel, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93304 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/03] | Eudes, Marcel, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc F-93304 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 79400536.3 | 27.07.1979 | [1980/03] | Priority number, date | FR19780022482 | 28.07.1978 Original published format: FR 7822482 | [1980/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0007876 | Date: | 06.02.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/34, B65D77/30 | [1980/03] | CPC: |
A47J31/407 (EP,US);
B65D77/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/03] | Title | German: | Kapsel für eine Dosis eines Produkts und Verfahren zur Distribution dieser Dosis | [1980/03] | English: | Capsule for a product dose and method for distributing the dose | [1980/03] | French: | Capsule pour dose de produit à distribuer et procédé de distribution de la dose | [1980/03] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 04.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/23] | 05.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2063398 [ ]; | FR2322796 [ ] (MANARESI ADRIANA [IT]) |