EP0008991 - Improvement in fire detectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.1981 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel B.P. 510 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | For all designated states LA DETECTION ELECTRONIQUE FRANCAISE PROTECBAT Société dite: 20 Rue de la République 92170 Vanves / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel B.P. 510 F-75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | ||
For all designated states LA DETECTION ELECTRONIQUE FRANCAISE PROTECBAT Société dite: 20 Rue de la République F-92170 Vanves / FR | |||
Former [1980/06] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states LA DETECTION ELECTRONIQUE FRANCAISE PROTECBAT Société dite: 20 Rue de la République F-92170 Vanves / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mars, Jean 21, rue Lauriston F-75016 Paris / FR | 02 /
Roux, Guy 47, Route de Palaiseau F-91300 Massy / FR | [1980/06] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1980/06] | Application number, filing date | 79400628.8 | 07.09.1979 | [1980/06] | Priority number, date | FR19780025999 | 11.09.1978 Original published format: FR 7825999 | [1980/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0008991 | Date: | 19.03.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.12.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/10 | [1980/06] | CPC: |
G08B17/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/06] | Title | German: | Verbesserung an Branddetektoren | [1980/06] | English: | Improvement in fire detectors | [1980/06] | French: | Perfectionnement aux détecteurs à incendie | [1980/06] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 21.08.1980 | Examination requested [1980/23] | 04.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1185495 [ ] |