EP0010500 - Improved massage apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.03.1983 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIERRE FABRE S.A. 125, rue de la Faisanderie 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states PIERRE FABRE S.A. 125, rue de la Faisanderie F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1980/09] | For all designated states PIERRE FABRE S.A. 125, rue de la Faisanderie F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Serre, Hubert, Dr. 9, rue de la République Mazamet 81 / FR | [1980/09] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/09] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 79400756.7 | 17.10.1979 | [1980/09] | Priority number, date | FR19780029661 | 18.10.1978 Original published format: FR 7829661 | [1980/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010500 | Date: | 30.04.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A61H15/00 | [1980/09] | CPC: |
A61H15/0092 (EP);
A61H2015/0028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/09] | Title | German: | Verbessertes Massagegerät | [1980/09] | English: | Improved massage apparatus | [1980/09] | French: | Appareil de massage perfectionné | [1980/09] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 09.06.1980 | Examination requested [1980/17] | 10.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1983/21] | 14.02.1983 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1983/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1650528 [ ]; | FR1197963 [ ]; | FR1335549 [ ]; | FR1063499 [ ] |