EP0012645 - Sheet antenna composed of two circular rings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1984 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Havot, Henri Albert Paul 13, rue de La Prée 35510 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | [1980/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/13] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Louis François CABINET Louis LE GUEN 38, rue Levavasseur B.P. 91 35802 Dinard Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | Le Guen, Louis François CABINET Louis LE GUEN 38, rue Levavasseur B.P. 91 F-35802 Dinard Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1980/13] | Le Guen, Louis François 13, rue Emile Bara BP 91 F-35800 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 79400907.6 | 23.11.1979 | [1980/13] | Priority number, date | FR19780034424 | 27.11.1978 Original published format: FR 7834424 | [1980/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0012645 | Date: | 25.06.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0012645 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/26, H01Q9/28, H01Q1/38, H01Q13/10 | [1980/13] | CPC: |
H01Q9/28 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q13/10 (EP,US);
H01Q9/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/13] | Title | German: | Antenne aus zwei kreisförmigen flachen Ringen | [1980/13] | English: | Sheet antenna composed of two circular rings | [1980/13] | French: | Antenne en plaque à double boucle circulaire | [1980/13] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 23.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/11] | 04.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.06.1983 | NL | 22.06.1983 | SE | 22.06.1983 | AT | 01.07.1983 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 22.06.1983 | |
NL | 22.06.1983 | ||
SE | 22.06.1983 | ||
AT | 01.07.1983 | ||
Former [1985/25] | NL | 22.06.1983 | |
SE | 22.06.1983 | ||
AT | 01.07.1983 | ||
Former [1984/06] | NL | 22.06.1983 | |
SE | 22.06.1983 | ||
Former [1983/43] | SE | 22.06.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | FR938846 [ ] (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP); | US2935747 [ ] (GHOSE RABINDRA N); | GB853472 [ ] (EMI LTD); | FR2119901 [ ] (SONY CORP); | NL7300260 [ ]; | FR2311422 [ ] (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) |