EP0012082 - Screw or snap-on tamper-proof closure molded in one piece from plastics material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVEMBAL S.A. 6 Boulevard du Général Leclerc F-92115 Clichy / FR | [1980/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brun, Louis 12 Square Alfred de Musset Champfleury F-78190 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | [1980/12] | Representative(s) | Collignon, Pierre, et al Cabinet Collignon 6, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | Collignon, Pierre, et al Cabinet Collignon 6, rue de Madrid F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 79400931.6 | 29.11.1979 | [1980/12] | Priority number, date | FR19780033943 | 01.12.1978 Original published format: FR 7833943 | [1980/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0012082 | Date: | 11.06.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0012082 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B65D55/02, B65D41/34 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
B65D41/0421 (EP);
B65D41/3428 (EP);
B65D41/3447 (EP);
B65D2401/30 (EP);
B65D2401/35 (EP);
B65D2401/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1980/12] | B65D41/34 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LU, NL [1980/12] | Title | German: | Einteilig aus Kunststoff geformter Schraub- oder Schnappverschluss mit Originalitäts-Sicherung | [1980/12] | English: | Screw or snap-on tamper-proof closure molded in one piece from plastics material | [1980/12] | French: | Bouchon inviolable, à vis ou encliquetable, en une seule pièce moulée en matière thermoplastique | [1980/12] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 28.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.12.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.1982 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE2150709 [ ] (HEINLEIN HANS); | FR2176620 [ ] (CHANDRAKANT SOMABHAL PAT [IN]) |