EP0003944 - Process and apparatus for air conditioning greenhouses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/06] | Processes and apparatuses for air conditioning greenhouses | ||
[1981/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANVAR Agence Nationale de Valorisation de la Recherche 13, rue Madeleine Michelis F-92522 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [1980/14] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states Etablissement Public dit: AGENCE NATIONALE DE VALORISATION DE LA RECHERCHE. A.N.V.A.R. 13, rue Madeleine Michelis F-92522 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Comte, Paul 42, Boulevard d'Aguillon F-06600 Antibes / FR | 02 /
Repetti, René Villa La Sousto Quartier de Nartassier F-06250 Mougins / FR | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Azais, Henri, et al c/o CABINET BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado 13008 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | Azais, Henri, et al c/o CABINET BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado F-13008 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 79430004.6 | 13.02.1979 | Priority number, date | FR19780004999 | 17.02.1978 Original published format: FR 7804999 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003944 | Date: | 05.09.1979 | Language: | FR | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003944 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/24, G02B5/24 | [1981/06] | CPC: |
A01G9/243 (EP,US);
F24S10/502 (EP,US);
F24S50/80 (EP,US);
Y02A40/25 (EP,US);
Y02E10/44 (EP,US);
Y02P60/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Klimaregulierung in Gewächshäusern | English: | Process and apparatus for air conditioning greenhouses | [1981/06] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour climatiser des serres | [1981/06] |
Former [1981/06] | Processes and apparatuses for air conditioning greenhouses | ||
Former [1981/06] | Procédés et dispositifs pour climatiser des serres | Examination procedure | 03.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/07] | 25.06.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.07.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.08.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3107052 [ ] (GARRISON JOEL F); | FR2344217 [ ] (TRIMBOLI LONGETTO ANTONINO [ES]) |