EP0003714 - Device for screwing-on fixation means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SFS Stadler AG. Nefenstrasse 30 CH-9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bögel, Gerhard Aechelistrasse 20 CH-9435 Heerbrugg / CH | 02 /
Sahli, Max Konradstrasse 10 CH-9450 Altstätten / CH | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Werffeli, Heinz Ralph Postfach 275 Waldgartenstrasse 12 8125 Zollikerberg-Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/17] | Werffeli, Heinz R., Dipl.-Ing.ETH. Postfach 275 Waldgartenstrasse 12 CH-8125 Zürich-Zollikerberg / CH | Application number, filing date | 79810002.0 | 15.01.1979 | Priority number, date | AT19780001063 | 14.02.1978 Original published format: AT 106378 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003714 | Date: | 22.08.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003714 | Date: | 29.04.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B25B21/00, B25B23/08 | [1981/17] | CPC: |
E04D15/04 (EP,US);
B25B21/00 (EP,US);
B25B23/10 (EP,US);
E04D2015/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einschrauben von Befestigungsmitteln | English: | Device for screwing-on fixation means | French: | Machine pour visser des moyens de fixation | Examination procedure | 24.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/08] | 13.08.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.10.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 15.01.1982 | CH | 31.01.1982 | LU | 31.01.1982 | [1999/52] |
Former [1983/43] | BE | 15.01.1982 | |
CH | 31.01.1982 | Documents cited: | Search | CH282474 [ ] (GOBIN DAUDE SA [FR]); | BE727454 [ ] |