EP0005122 - Hydrocarbons collecting barrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.1981 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.1981 [1981/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Favre, Ernest CH-1725 Ecuvillens / CH | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Charbonnier, Georges R., et al Avenue de Miremont 11 1206 Genève / CH | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79810034.3 | 24.04.1979 | Priority number, date | CH19780004363 | 24.04.1978 Original published format: CH 436378 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005122 | Date: | 31.10.1979 | Language: | FR | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | E02B15/04, B65D89/10 | CPC: |
E02B15/06 (EP,US);
Y02A20/204 (EP,US);
Y10S210/923 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, IT, NL | Title | German: | Kohlenwasserstoffe aufspeichernde Sperre | English: | Hydrocarbons collecting barrier | French: | Barrage collecteur d'hydrocarbures | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 08.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/12] | 10.12.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1981/47] | 13.08.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1981 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1232739 [ ]; | FR2109143 [ ] (AQUANOX INC); | US3703084 [ ] (NUGENT JOHN B); | GB1336937 [ ] (CERSARI N P); | US3886750 [ ] (AYERS RAY R, et al); | FR2357687 [ ] (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD [JP]) |