EP0010069 - Process for the preparation of foam glass granulates by swelling in an oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/08] | Foam glass granules and process for the preparation thereof | ||
[1985/34] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.08.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Millcell AG Brünigstrasse 81 CH-6060 Sarnen / CH | [1980/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vieli, Otto Anton Casa Vieli CH-7499 RhäzÜns / CH | [1980/08] | Representative(s) | Wann, Ingrid, et al Schmauder & Wann, Patentanwaltsbüro Zwängiweg 7 CH-8038 Zürich / CH | [1984/52] |
Former [1980/08] | Brühwiler, Hans Brühwiler, Meier & Co. Patentanwälte VSP Löwenstrasse 1 Postfach 996 CH-8021 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 79810115.0 | 04.10.1979 | [1980/08] | Priority number, date | CH19780010440 | 06.10.1978 Original published format: CH 1044078 | [1980/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010069 | Date: | 16.04.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010069 | Date: | 01.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/35] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0010069 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C03C11/00, C03B19/08, C04B31/02 | [1980/08] | CPC: |
C04B14/24 (EP,US);
C03B19/108 (EP,US);
C03B19/1085 (EP,US);
C03C11/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines durch Ofenblähung erzeugten Schaumglas-Granulates | [1985/34] | English: | Process for the preparation of foam glass granulates by swelling in an oven | [1985/34] | French: | Procédé de préparation de granulés de verre-mousse par expansion dans un four | [1985/34] |
Former [1980/08] | Schaumglas-Granulat und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | ||
Former [1980/08] | Foam glass granules and process for the preparation thereof | ||
Former [1980/08] | Granulés de verre-mousse et procédé pour leur fabrication | Examination procedure | 12.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/14] | 29.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 08.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.03.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.04.1983
30.05.1983
ADMISSIBLE Veit Dennert KG Baustoffbetriebe D-8602 Schlüsselfeld / DE | [1983/26] | 05.07.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.02.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.01.1986 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.03.1986 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.04.1986 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.07.1986 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1982 | AT | 04.10.1985 | SE | 05.10.1985 | BE | 31.10.1985 | NL | 01.05.1986 | FR | 30.06.1986 | [2015/21] |
Former [2002/02] | LU | 31.10.1982 | |
AT | 04.10.1985 | ||
SE | 05.10.1985 | ||
BE | 31.10.1985 | ||
CH | 31.10.1985 | ||
NL | 01.05.1986 | ||
FR | 30.06.1986 | ||
Former [1999/52] | LU | 31.10.1982 | |
AT | 04.10.1985 | ||
GB | 04.10.1985 | ||
SE | 05.10.1985 | ||
BE | 31.10.1985 | ||
CH | 31.10.1985 | ||
NL | 01.05.1986 | ||
FR | 30.06.1986 | ||
Former [1998/51] | AT | 04.10.1985 | |
GB | 04.10.1985 | ||
SE | 05.10.1985 | ||
BE | 31.10.1985 | ||
CH | 31.10.1985 | ||
NL | 01.05.1986 | ||
FR | 30.06.1986 | ||
Former [1991/51] | AT | 04.10.1985 | |
GB | 04.10.1985 | ||
SE | 05.10.1985 | ||
BE | 31.10.1985 | ||
CH | 31.10.1985 | ||
NL | 01.05.1986 | ||
DE | 01.07.1986 | ||
Former [1989/26] | AT | 04.10.1985 | |
GB | 04.10.1985 | ||
SE | 05.10.1985 | ||
CH | 31.10.1985 | ||
NL | 01.05.1986 | ||
DE | 01.07.1986 | ||
Former [1989/20] | AT | 04.10.1985 | |
SE | 05.10.1985 | ||
CH | 31.10.1985 | ||
NL | 01.05.1986 | ||
DE | 01.07.1986 | ||
Former [1989/15] | AT | 04.10.1985 | |
SE | 05.10.1985 | ||
NL | 01.05.1986 | ||
DE | 01.07.1986 | ||
Former [1989/08] | AT | 04.10.1985 | |
SE | 05.10.1985 | ||
NL | 01.05.1986 | ||
Former [1988/24] | AT | 04.10.1985 | |
NL | 01.05.1986 | ||
Former [1987/20] | AT | 04.10.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | US3207588 [ ] (GAMES SLAYTER, et al); | US3321414 [ ] (ANTON VIELI OTTO); | CH499470 [ ] (UTOLIT AG [CH]); | CH502964 [ ] (TRASSWERKE MEURIN BETR SGMBH [DE]); | FR2142561 [ ] (SHIKOKU KAKEN KOGYO KK); | CH539004 [ ] (UTOLIT AG [CH]); | DE2820432 [ ] (BFG GLASSGROUP); | US4143202 [ ] (TSENG EUGENE, et al) |