EP0010522 - Transparent copolyamides, process for their production and their use in the manufacture of moulded articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/09] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfeifer, Josef, Dr. Brunnmattstrasse 32 CH-4106 Therwil / CH | [1980/09] | Application number, filing date | 79810127.5 | 12.10.1979 | [1980/09] | Priority number, date | CH19780010773 | 18.10.1978 Original published format: CH 1077378 | [1980/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010522 | Date: | 30.04.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010522 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/26, C08G69/28 | [1980/09] | CPC: |
C08G69/265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/09] | Title | German: | Transparente Copolyamide, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung zur Herstellung von Formkörpern | [1980/09] | English: | Transparent copolyamides, process for their production and their use in the manufacture of moulded articles | [1980/09] | French: | Copolyamides transparents, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation dans la fabrication d'objets moulés | [1980/09] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1979 | Examination requested [1980/09] | 13.11.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.02.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1410007 [ ] (BP CHEM INT LTD); | CH498893 [ ] (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]); | DE2715860 [ ] (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO); | FR2324672 [ ] (INVENTA AG [CH]) |