EP0013256 - Apparatus for removing creases from fabrics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TERSON 25a, Rue du Chablais F-74103 Annemasse / FR | For all designated states Terraillon, Marc Résidence du Parc F-74240 Gaillard / FR | [1980/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mazzucco, Daniel 3, Rue de l'Ecole Maternelle F-74000 Annemasse / FR | [1980/14] | Representative(s) | Kirker, Gaylord Emile, et al c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, Rue du Mont-Blanc Case postale 872 CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH | [1980/14] | Application number, filing date | 79810140.8 | 31.10.1979 | [1980/14] | Priority number, date | CH19780013029 | 21.12.1978 Original published format: CH 1302978 | [1980/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013256 | Date: | 09.07.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013256 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | D06F75/30, D06F87/00, H01R13/44 | [1980/19] | CPC: |
D06F75/30 (EP,US);
D06F87/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/14] | D06F75/30, D06F87/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1980/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Beseitigen von Knitterfalten aus Geweben | [1980/14] | English: | Apparatus for removing creases from fabrics | [1980/14] | French: | Appareil à défroisser les tissus | [1980/14] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/09] | 24.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.04.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1982 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US2384644 [ ] (SCHREYER EDWARD P); | GB1315083 [ ] (RAYMOND IND LTD); | GB1338108 [ ] (DOYEL J S); | US3646317 [ ] (OSROW LEONARD); | US3579262 [ ] (PEEPS DONALD J); | US3755649 [ ] (OSROW L); | FR1017946 [ ]; | DE573813 [ ] (HERMANN WEISS); | US1927316 [ ] (MAX KATZMAN); | FR2024201 [ ] (VILBISS CY) |