EP0010078 - Wind turbine of cross-flow type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.1984 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ljungström, Olle Sälgstigen 12 S-181 62 Lidingö / SE | [1980/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/08] | Representative(s) | Geralf, Wilhelm, et al W Geralf Patentbyra AB Kungsgatan 33 111 56 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/08] | Geralf, Wilhelm, et al W Geralf Patentbyra AB Kungsgatan 33 S-111 56 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 79850092.2 | 04.10.1979 | [1980/08] | Priority number, date | SE19780010503 | 06.10.1978 Original published format: SE 7810503 | [1980/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0010078 | Date: | 16.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0010078 | Date: | 28.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010078 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F03D3/06 | [1980/08] | CPC: |
F03D3/061 (EP,US);
F05B2240/214 (EP,US);
Y02E10/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1980/08] | Title | German: | Querstrom-Windkraftmaschine | [1980/08] | English: | Wind turbine of cross-flow type | [1980/08] | French: | Eolienne à courant transversal | [1980/08] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 21.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/05] | 27.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1982 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.11.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.05.1983 | [2002/24] | Documents cited: | Search | US3918839 [ ] (BLACKWELL BENNIE F, et al); | FR2319028 [ ] (NAT RES DEV [GB]); | DE2630487 [ ] (RUECKSTAEDTER HANS) |