EP0031862 - Method and apparatus for aftertreatment of textile sheet by application of microwaves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/28] | Improved method and apparatus for aftertreatment of textile material by application of microwaves | ||
[1984/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1984 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.1985 [1985/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE ICHIKIN, LTD. 673-1, Nomura-cho Kusatsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/28] | For all designated states THE ICHIKIN, LTD. 673-1, Nomura-cho Kusatsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawaguchi, Bunshiro 21, Kuroiwa Misasagi Yamashina Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-Shi Kyoto-fu / JP | [1981/28] | Representative(s) | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/28] | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188 S-203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 79850116.9 | 28.12.1979 | [1981/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0031862 | Date: | 15.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0031862 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | D06B19/00, D06P5/20 | [1981/28] | CPC: |
D06P5/2016 (EP);
D06B19/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT [1981/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zum Nachbehandeln von textilen Warenbahnen durch Verwendung von Mikrowellen | [1984/06] | English: | Method and apparatus for aftertreatment of textile sheet by application of microwaves | [1984/06] | French: | Procédé et appareillage pour le post-traitement de bandes textiles au moyen de micro-ondes | [1984/06] |
Former [1981/28] | Verfahren und Apparat zum Nachbehandeln von Textilgut durch Verwendung von Mikrowellen | ||
Former [1981/28] | Improved method and apparatus for aftertreatment of textile material by application of microwaves | ||
Former [1981/28] | Procédé et appareillage pour le post-traitement de matières textiles au moyen de micro-ondes | Examination procedure | 12.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/43] | 28.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.01.1980 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   20.03.1980 | 28.01.1980 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   20.03.1980 | 28.01.1980 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   20.03.1980 | 28.01.1980 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   20.03.1980 | 28.01.1980 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   20.03.1980 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB817134 [ ]; | GB704972 [ ]; | GB1482755 [ ]; | GB1124787 [ ]; | GB1257807 [ ]; | FR2375384 [ ]; | FR1344538 [ ]; | EP0003684 [ ]; | GB947280 [ ] |