EP0015958 - THERMOPLASTIC WELDING SLEEVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1984 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.1984 [1984/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STURM, Werner Allerheiligenstrasse 624 CH-4614 Hägendorf / CH | For all designated states VON ROLL AG 4563 Gerlafingen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | For all designated states STURM, Werner Allerheiligenstrasse 624 CH-4614 Hägendorf / CH | ||
For all designated states VON ROLL AG CH-4563 Gerlafingen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STURM, Werner Allerheiligenstrasse 624 CH-4614 Hägendorf / CH | [1980/20] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Saurer, Reinhardt c/o Egli Patentanwälte Postfach 473 CH-8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | Meyer, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Egli Patentanwälte Postfach 473 CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 79900439.5 | 30.04.1979 | [1980/20] | WO1979CH00060 | Priority number, date | CH19780004760 | 02.05.1978 Original published format: CH 476078 | [1980/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO7901018 | Date: | 29.11.1979 | [1979/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0015958 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.1979 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0015958 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/45] | Classification | IPC: | F16L47/02, B29C27/06 | [1980/20] | CPC: |
B29D23/005 (EP);
B29C61/0625 (EP);
B29C65/342 (EP);
B29C65/3476 (EP);
B29C65/68 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/5221 (EP);
B29C66/5229 (EP);
B29C66/63 (EP);
B29C66/91651 (EP);
B29C70/82 (EP);
F16L47/03 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/347, B29C65/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1980/20] | Title | German: | ELEKTRO-SCHWEISSMUFFE AUS THERMOPLASTICHEM MATERIAL | [1980/20] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC WELDING SLEEVE | [1980/20] | French: | MANCHON A SOUDER EN MATIERE THERMOPLASTIQUE | [1980/20] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1980 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/20] | 21.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.04.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE1117297 [ ] (SUED WEST CHEMIE GMBH); | CH515449 [ ] (ROLLMAPLAST AG [CH]); | CH544906 [ ] (GERBERT & CIE [CH]); | DE2302458 [ ] (MANNESMANN AG); | FR2345652 [ ] (STURM WERNER [CH], et al); | FR2392796 [ ] (STURM WERNER [CH]) |