EP0016021 - DEVICE FOR INSERTING THE WEFT BY MEANS OF A FLUID IN A LOOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/20] | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR INSERTING THE WEFT BY MEANS OF A FLUID FLOW IN A LOOM | ||
[1983/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1984 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.1984 [1984/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PETSCHNER, Goetz Im Walder 28 CH-8702 Zollikon / CH | For all designated states Scheffel, Walter Hopfenstrasse 22 P.B. 528 D-8832 Weissenburg/Bayern / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/38] | For all designated states PETSCHNER, Goetz Im Walder 28 CH-8702 Zollikon / CH | ||
For all designated states Scheffel, Walter Hopfenstrasse 22 P.B. 528 D-8832 Weissenburg/Bayern / DE | |||
Former [1980/20] | For all designated states PETSCHNER, Goetz Im Walder 28 CH-8702 Zollikon / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEFFEL, Walter Hopfenstrasse 14 D-8832 Weissenburg / DE | [1980/20] | Representative(s) | Petschner, Goetz Patentanwaltsbüro Petschner & Partner Rothusmatt 5 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | Petschner, Goetz Patentanwaltsbüro G. Petschner Wannenstrasse 16 CH-8800 Thalwil / CH | Application number, filing date | 79900605.1 | 12.06.1979 | [1980/20] | WO1979CH00087 | Priority number, date | DE19782825679 | 12.06.1978 Original published format: DE 2825679 | DE19792919026 | 11.05.1979 Original published format: DE 2919026 | [1980/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8000087 | Date: | 24.01.1980 | [1980/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016021 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0016021 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/47] | Classification | IPC: | D03D47/30 | [1980/20] | CPC: |
D03D47/302 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1980/20] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUSSEINTRAG MITTELS EINES FLUIDUM AN EINER WEBMASCHINE | [1983/47] | English: | DEVICE FOR INSERTING THE WEFT BY MEANS OF A FLUID IN A LOOM | [1983/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'INSERTION DE LA TRAME AU MOYEN D'UN FLUIDE DANS UN METIER | [1983/47] |
Former [1980/20] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUSSEINTRAG AN WEBMASCHINEN MITTELS EINES STRÖMENDEN MEDIUMS | ||
Former [1980/20] | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR INSERTING THE WEFT BY MEANS OF A FLUID FLOW IN A LOOM | ||
Former [1980/20] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'INSERTION DE LA TRAME AU MOYEN D'UN COURANT DE FLUIDE DANS UN METIER | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1980 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/21] | 26.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.02.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1801044 (SULZER AG); | DE2145256 [ ]; | US3847187 [ ] (BURAN V, et al) |