EP0016138 - HYDROPHILIC, SOFT AND OXYGEN PERMEABLE COPOLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1985 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 19.06.1985 [1985/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHANG, Sing-Hsiung 26 Huntington Drive Danbury, CT 06811 / US | [1980/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/20] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | [1980/20] | Application number, filing date | 79900856.0 | 14.06.1979 | [1980/20] | WO1979US00441 | Priority number, date | US19780925640 | 17.07.1978 Original published format: US 925640 | [1980/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8000253 | Date: | 21.02.1980 | [1980/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016138 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0016138 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C08F26/08, C08F20/06, C08F30/08, C08F230/08 | [1980/20] | CPC: |
G02B1/04 (EP,US);
C08F230/08 (EP,US);
C08F283/124 (EP,US);
G02B1/043 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F230/08, C08F226/06 (US);
C08F230/08, C08F226/10 (EP,US);
G02B1/043, C08L39/00 (US,EP);
G02B1/043, C08L43/04 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, SE [1980/20] | Title | German: | HYDROPHILE, WEICHE UND SAUERSTOFF DURCHLÄSSIGE COPOLYMER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1980/20] | English: | HYDROPHILIC, SOFT AND OXYGEN PERMEABLE COPOLYMER COMPOSITIONS | [1980/20] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE COPOLYMERS HYDROPHILE, DOUCES ET PERMEABLES A L'OXYGENE | [1980/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.1980 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.1980 | Search fee paid | 05.03.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.1980 | Examination requested [1980/24] | 12.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.11.1983 | SE | 09.11.1983 | [1985/25] |
Former [1984/31] | SE | 09.11.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | GB868188 [ ] (MIDLAND SILICONES LTD) | International search | [X]US3808178 (GAYLORD N); | [A]US3849238 (GOULD F, et al); | [A]US3948871 (BUTTERFIELD JR GEORGE H, et al); | [A]GB1480880 (BAUSCH & LOMB); | [X]US4099859 (MERRILL EDWARD W); | [XP]US4120570 (GAYLORD NORMAN G); | [AP]US4138382 (POLMANTEER KEITH E); | [XP]US4139513 (TANAKA KYOICHI, et al); | [XP]US4153641 (DEICHERT WILLIAM G, et al) |