EP0020362 - WELDING TORCH COOLED BY LIQUID-GAS TRANSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.1981 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Tractor Co. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANTZREB, John G., Sr. 509 West Forrest Lawn Avenue Peoria, IL 61614 / US | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/01] | Wagner, Karl H. (DE) Wagner & Geyer Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 79900942.8 | 07.12.1978 | [1981/01] | WO1978US00193 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8001147 | Date: | 12.06.1980 | [1980/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020362 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/00 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
B23K9/285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/13] |
Former [1981/01] | CH, DE, FR, GB, SE | Title | German: | DURCH FLÜSSIGKEIT-GASÜBERFÜHRUNG GEKÜHLTER SCHWEISSBRENNER | [1981/01] | English: | WELDING TORCH COOLED BY LIQUID-GAS TRANSITION | [1981/01] | French: | TORCHE DE SOUDAGE REFROIDIE PAR TRANSITION LIQUIDE-GAZ | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.1980 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.1980 | Search fee paid | 09.06.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 09.10.1980 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, SE | 20.12.1980 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.08.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2468807 ; | [A]US2512705 ; | [X]US2870320 ; | [X]US3217133 ; | [A]US3803381 ; | [X]US4024374 ; | [E]US4158763 ; | [X]SU603525 | [X] - AUTOMATIC WELDING, No. 2, issued 1975, V.K. BONDAREV, "A New System for Suprlying Welding Stations with Liquefied Carbon Dioxide"see pages 63-64. |