EP0016177 - HYBRID SIGNATURE TEST METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.1980 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLUKE TRENDAR CORPORATION 630 Clyde Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [1980/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAM, Tim Yee 970 Erica Drive Sunnyvale, Ca 94086 / US | 02 /
Saper, Barry Morton 25733 Vinedo Lane Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | [1980/20] | Application number, filing date | 79900948.5 | 30.07.1979 | [1980/20] | WO1979US00556 | Priority number, date | US19780933019 | 11.08.1978 Original published format: US 933019 | [1980/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8000375 | Date: | 03.04.1980 | [1980/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016177 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/20] | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/26, G06F11/00 | [1980/20] | CPC: |
G01R31/318385 (EP,US);
G01R31/3193 (EP,US);
G06F11/277 (EP,US);
G06F2201/83 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1980/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN HYBRIDEN SIGNALZEICHENTEST | [1980/20] | English: | HYBRID SIGNATURE TEST METHOD AND APPARATUS | [1980/20] | French: | METHODE ET APPAREIL D'ESSAI A SIGNATURE HYBRIDE | [1980/20] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 04.08.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1981/02] | 16.10.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3924181 (ALDERSON GARY E); | [A]US3976864 (GORDON GARY B, et al); | [A]US4059749 (FEILCHENFELD MICHAL M); | [AT]US4139147 (FRANKE ROBERT H) | [A] - IEEE Transactions on Computers, issued January 1978, JOHN P. HAYES, Generation of Optimal Transition Count Testssee pages 36 to 41. | [A] - Electronics, issued 3 March 1977, Gordon and Nadig, Hexadecimal Signatures Identify Troublespots in Microprocessor Systemssee pages 89 to 96. |