EP0020374 - WRITING IMPLEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1984 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.1984 [1984/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.T. DUPONT Tour Maine-Montparnasse 33, avenue du Maine F-75755 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [1981/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALAMOUD, Jean Lotissement Denizot F-74410 Saint Jorioz / FR | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Brot, Philippe, et al CABINET BROT 83, rue d'Amsterdam F-75008 Paris / FR | [1981/01] | Application number, filing date | 79900992.3 | 24.08.1979 | [1981/01] | WO1979FR00076 | Priority number, date | FR19780025994 | 11.09.1978 Original published format: FR 7825994 | [1981/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8000557 | Date: | 03.04.1980 | [1980/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020374 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020374 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/22] | Classification | IPC: | B65D55/02, B43K9/00, B43K5/00 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
B43K23/12 (EP,US);
B43K5/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1981/01] | Title | German: | SCHREIBINSTRUMENT | [1981/01] | English: | WRITING IMPLEMENT | [1981/01] | French: | INSTRUMENT A ECRIRE | [1981/01] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.1980 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 20.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR444216 (LOUIS WALDMANN [FR]); | US1764470 [ ] (ROMERO ANTONIO S); | [X]CH250087 (HORSAK DRAHOMIR [CZ]); | [A]DE1006755 (ARMIN KATZ); | US3430795 [ ] (LAUFER WILLIAM); | US3520435 [ ] (MCINTOSH JAMES A); | US3841513 [ ] (O CONNOR I); | US3868036 [ ] (WITTWER JOHN C); | FR2369976 [ ] (MAYET JEAN FRANCOIS [FR]) |