EP0020397 - PHOTOGRAPHIC BLEACH COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF PHOTOGRAPHIC PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Kodak Limited Kodak House, Station Road Hemel Hempstead Hertfordshire HP1 1JU / GB | For:CH
DE
FR
NL
Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For:GB
Kodak Limited Kodak House, Station Road Hemel Hempstead Hertfordshire HP1 1JU / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
FR
NL
Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | |||
Former [1982/19] | For:GB
Kodak Limited Kodak House Station Road Hemel Hempstead Hertfordshire HP1 1JU / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
FR
NL
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | |||
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states KODAK LIMITED P.O. Box 66 Station Road Hemel Hempstead Herts, HP1 1JU / GB | ||
For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FYSON, John R. 8 Meynell Crescent Hackney London E.9 7AS / GB | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Pepper, John Herbert, et al KODAK LIMITED Patent Department P.O. Box 114 190 High Holborn London WC1V 7EA / GB | [1982/21] |
Former [1981/01] | Trangmar, Leigh Alan 66 The Avenue Beckenham Kent / GB | Application number, filing date | 79901091.3 | 14.09.1979 | [1981/01] | WO1979GB00152 | Priority number, date | GB19360081678 | 14.09.1978 Original published format: GB 3681678 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8000624 | Date: | 03.04.1980 | [1980/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020397 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020397 | Date: | 10.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/45] | Classification | IPC: | G03C5/38, G03C5/44, G03C7/42 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
G03C5/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/01] | Title | German: | PHOTOGRAPHISCHE BLEICHMITTEL-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN PHOTOGRAPHISCHER BEARBEITUNG | [1981/01] | English: | PHOTOGRAPHIC BLEACH COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF PHOTOGRAPHIC PROCESSING | [1981/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE BLANCHIMENT PHOTOGRAPHIQUE ET PROCEDES DE DEVELOPPEMENT PHOTOGRAPHIQUE | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.1980 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 22.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.05.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE866605 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | DE1051117 [ ] (AGFA AG); | [X]FR1338856 (CADUM PALMOLIVE); | GB1032024 [ ] (ILFORD LTD); | GB1200188 [ ] (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]); | [X]FR2289935 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [X]DE2602987 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) | [ ] - Photographic Science and Engineering, Vol. 3, No. 3, issued 1959, May-June (Washington DC USA) R.W. HENN "The Calcium-Sequestering Properties of Organic Compounds in Photographic Developers", see page 142compound No 6. |